SC H3678 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Bridge Crossing The Csx And Norfolk Southern Railroad Tracks Along Blossom Street In The City Of Columbia In Richland County "the Honorable L. Casey Manning Bridge Respected Judge And Trailblazing Gamecock" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Bridge Containing These Words.
Title
The Honorable L. Casey Manning Bridge
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-02 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced |