SC H3691 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 48-5)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 48-5)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Act No. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 17-5-135 So As To Allow Coroners, Deputy Coroners, Or Coroners' Designees To Possess And Administer Opioid Antidotes Under Certain Circumstances; By Adding Section 44-130-90 So As To Provide Procedures For The Administration Of Opioid Antidotes By Coroners, Deputy Coroners, And Coroners' Designees And For The Reporting Of Their Use; By Amending Section 17-5-510, Relating To Duties Of Coroners And Medical Examiners, So As To Restate The Section; And By Adding Section 17-5-150 So As To Provide That Coroners And Deputy Coroners Are Considered Public Safety Officers If Killed In The Line Of Duty. - Ratified Title
Title
Coroners - First Responders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Act No. 66 | |
2023-05-26 | Effective date 05/19/23 | |
2023-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Ratified R 83 | |
2023-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0 |
2023-05-11 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: M.Johnson (ch), Sabb, Matthews, Talley, Adams |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-04-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-04-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2023-04-05 | House | Read second time |
2023-04-05 | House | Amended |
2023-04-04 | House | Debate adjourned |
2023-03-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cromer, Weeks |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Long, Caskey |
2023-02-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Moss, Bustos |
2023-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Landing, Kirby |
2023-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White |
2023-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton |
2023-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell, Connell, Hager |
2023-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Guest, Leber, J.E.Johnson, Pope, Brittain, McGinnis, Hardee, Hewitt, Jordan, Thayer, Anderson, Rutherford, Trantham, Bailey, Schuessler, Gagnon, Beach, Oremus, Forrest, S.Jones, Taylor, Hixon, Blackwell, Collins, Bannister, Hiott, Carter, O'Neal, Ligon, Guffey, Sessions, T.Moore, Nutt, Hayes |
2023-01-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-01-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith, Davis, B.L.Cox, Pace |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 5 | 135 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 5 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 5 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 130 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |