SC H3698 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 48-39-80, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Development Of The Coastal Management Program, So As To Deem Certain Coastal Zone Consistency Certifications Approved Within Thirty Days Of An Administratively Complete Application. - Ratified Title
Title
Coastal management program development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Act No. 28 | |
2019-05-16 | Effective date 05/13/19 | |
2019-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-09 | Ratified R 58 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-07 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-02-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hardee |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |