SC H3700 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-11 - Introduced and adopted HJ-8
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-11 - Introduced and adopted HJ-8
Summary
A HOUSE RESOLUTION TO RECOGNIZE THE IMPORTANCE OF WORLD TUBERCULOSIS DAY AS FOCUSING ATTENTION ON ONE OF THE WORLD'S DEADLIEST KILLERS AND TO DECLARE TUESDAY, MARCH 24, 2009, AS "SOUTH CAROLINA TUBERCULOSIS DAY."
Title
Recognize The Importance Of World Tuberculosis Day As Focusing Attention On One Of The World's Deadliest Killers And To Declare Tuesday, March 24, 2009, As "south Carolina Tuberculosis Day."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Introduced and adopted HJ-8 |
Same As/Similar To
S0592 (Similar To) 2009-03-31 - Adopted SJ-30
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3700&session=118 |