SC H3716 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Committed to Committee on Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Committed to Committee on Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Require A School District Board Of Trustees To Establish An Improvement Council At Each School In The District, Provide Who May Serve On The Council, Provide The Duties Of The Council, And Provide Terms For Council Members.
Title
Education Finance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 98 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: Table Motion to Adjourn Debate (Y: 98 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 98 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: Table Motion to Adjourn Debate (Y: 98 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Committed to Committee on Finance | |
2011-03-22 | Recalled from Committee on Education | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-03-09 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-03-08 | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-6 | |
2011-03-08 | Read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Requests for debate-Rep | |
2011-02-24 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, March 1, 2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
H3002 (Similar To) 2011-02-15 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Agnew