SC H3726 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Act No. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Act No. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-36-90, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Definition Of "gross Proceeds Of Sales", So As To Exclude Amounts Received From A Buydown. - Ratified Title
Title
Gross proceeds of sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Act No. 18 | |
2021-04-21 | Effective date 04/16/21 | |
2021-04-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-15 | Ratified R 27 | |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2021-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine, Ott |
2021-02-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rutherford |
2021-02-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0572 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Referred to Committee on Finance