SC H3733 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-30 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-30 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Make A Conforming Amendment.
Title
Roll-back tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-30 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2014-04-29 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-29 | House | Amended |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0487 (Similar To) 2013-03-06 - Referred to Committee on Finance