SC H3739 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Garners Ferry Road In Richland County From Its Intersection With United States Highway 601 To The Point Where It Crosses The Wateree River "lieutenant Ulysses Flemming Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Signs Or Markers Along This Portion Of Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Lieutenant Ulysses Flemming Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-02-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced |