SC H3748 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 171
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 16-11-680, Relating To The Unlawful Alteration Or Removal Of Boundary Landmarks, So As To Clarify That The Section Prohibits Maliciously Or Fraudulently Altering, Destroying, Or Removing Any Geodetic Control Monuments Or Property Corner Monuments, To Define Necessary Terms, And To Allow Restitution To Be Required As Part Of A Person's Sentence For A Conviction Under This Section. - Ratified Title
Title
Geodetic control monuments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Act No. 171 | |
2024-05-29 | Effective date 05/20/24 | |
2024-05-20 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-15 | Ratified R 208 | |
2024-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2024-05-09 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2024-05-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-05-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Amended |
2024-05-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-05-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Amended |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: M.Johnson (ch), Sabb, Talley, Adams, Devine |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2024-03-26 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-26 | House | Amended |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell, Yow |
2024-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robbins |
2023-04-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope |
2023-03-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2023-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0532 (Similar To) 2023-02-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary