SC H3800 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Act No. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Act No. 155
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 50-9-350, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Apprentice Hunting Licenses, So As To Allow For A Person With An Apprentice Hunting License To Waive The Certificate Of Completion Requirement; And To Amend Section 50-9-510, Relating To Hunting And Fishing Licenses, So As To Provide That A Nonresident Who Meets The Qualifications Of An Apprentice Hunter May Purchase A Three-day Hunting License. - Ratified Title
Title
Hunting licenses, apprentice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Act No. 155 | |
2020-10-02 | Effective date 11/27/20 | |
2020-09-28 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 177 | |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-1 |
2019-04-02 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-02 | House | Amended |
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest, Hixon |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced and read first time |