SC H3805 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 149 To Chapter 3, Title 56 So As To Provide The Department Of Motor Vehicles May Issue Various Military Special License Plates; And To Repeal Articles 7, 8, 14, 15, 16, 33, 38, 43, 53, 55, 56, 63, 68, 74, 84, 88, 99, 101, 102, 103, 104, 106, 107, 110, 111, 112, 115, 116, 117, 129, 131, 132, 143, And 144 Of Chapter 3, Title 56, Relating To The Issuance Of "wartime Disabled Veteran Special License Plates", Free Vehicular Registration For Former Prisoners Of War, The Issuance Of Special License Plates For Members Of The United States Military Reserves And National Guard, Medal Of Honor Recipients, Purple Heart Recipients, Members Of The American Legion, Retired Members Of The United States Armed Forces, Normandy Invasion, And Pearl Harbor Survivors, The Issuance Of Members Of The United States Armed Services, Support Our Troops, Korean War Veterans, Vietnam Veterans, Marine Corps League, World War Ii Veterans, Gold Star Family Operation Desert Storm-desert Shield, Operation Enduring Freedom Veteran, Operation Iraqi Freedom Veteran, Silver Star, Bronze Star, United States Navy Chief Petty Officer, United States Marine Corps, Distinguished Service Medal, Distinguished Service Cross, Department Of The Navy, Parents And Spouses Of Active-duty Overseas Veterans, Active Duty Members Of The United States Armed Forces, Combat-related Disabled Veteran, Recipients Of The Distinguished Flying Cross, Palmetto Cross, And Legion Of Merit Special License Plates. - Ratified Title
Title
Special license plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Act No. 38 | |
2021-05-13 | Effective date 05/06/22 | |
2021-05-04 | Ratified R 51 | |
2021-05-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-04-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-03-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Taylor, S.Williams, S.Williams, Matthews |
2021-03-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2021-03-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-116 Nays-0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-04 | House | Amended |
2021-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton, Ligon, Blackwell, R.Williams, Jefferson |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3095 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Member