SC H3856 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Chapman
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Chapman
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 23-3-340 So As To Provide When Persons Diagnosed With Alzheimer's Disease Or Dementia Are Reported Missing, The State Law Enforcement Division Must Send Wireless Emergency Alert Notifications To Law Enforcement Agencies And The Public Regarding The Missing Persons.
Title
Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia Alerts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Chapman |
2023-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby |
2023-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |