SC H3869 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-23 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require Licensees Complete Certain Continuing Education Approved By The Commission, And To Provide A Residential Specialty Contractor Who Has Completed Continuing Educational Requirements In Addition To Other Existing Requirements Is Exempt From Related Additional Examinations Required By A County Or Municipality.
Title
Residential Builders Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-04-18 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2013-04-17 | House | Read second time |
2013-04-17 | House | Amended |
2013-04-17 | House | Debate adjourned |
2013-04-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bales |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-03-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |