SC H3890 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Act No. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Act No. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 22-5-920, Relating To Youthful Offender Eligibility For Expungement Of Certain Offenses, So As To Allow Expungement For Convictions Involving A Driving Under Suspension Offense Or A Disturbing Schools Offense. - Ratified Title
Title
Youthful offenders, eligibility
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Rose [D] | Rep. Christopher Murphy [R] | Rep. Gary Brewer [R] | Rep. Cody Mitchell [R] |
Rep. Robby Robbins [R] | Rep. Carla Schuessler [R] | Rep. Val Guest [R] | Rep. John King [D] |
Rep. Brandon Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House: Override Veto By The Governor (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 18 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House: Override Veto By The Governor (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 18 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Act No. 73 | |
2023-06-26 | Effective date 06/14/23 | |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Veto overridden Ayes-34 Nays-2 |
2023-06-07 | House | Veto overridden Yeas-94 Nays-4 |
2023-05-22 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Ratified R 85 | |
2023-05-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2023-05-16 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2023-05-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-2 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-04-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Sabb, Adams, Garrett, Gustafson |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 |
2023-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2023-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton |
2023-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2023-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Murphy, Brewer, Mitchell, Robbins, Schuessler, Guest |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |