SC H3933 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Department Shall Supply An Additional Two License Plates To A Full-service Dealer Who Can Demonstrate The Presence Of A Service Garage At His Dealership.
Title
Dealer license plates
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Willis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-04-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced and read first time |