SC H3967 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-16)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Effective date 05/14/20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-16)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Effective date 05/14/20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 24-13-35 So As To Provide Requirements Concerning The Treatment Of Female Inmates, And To Provide Requirements For The Authorization Of Periodic Visits Between Such Inmates And Their Minor Dependents. - Ratified Title
Title
Inmate restraint
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | Effective date 05/14/20 | |
2020-05-19 | Act No. 136 | |
2020-05-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-05-12 | Ratified R 141 | |
2020-05-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-117 Nays-0 |
2020-05-12 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2020-03-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Corrections and Penology |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Polled out of committee Corrections and Penology |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-3 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore, Hill |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2019-02-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox |
2019-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose |
2019-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Garvin |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |