SC H3992 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 41-31-60, Relating To Delinquent Unemployment Compensation Tax Rates, So As To Permit Employers With Installment Payment Agreements Approved By The Department Of Employment And Workforce To Pay The Tax At A Specified Annual Statutory Rate, And To Provide For The Automatic Reversion Of This Rate Upon Failure To Timely Comply With The Payment Agreement. - Ratified Title
Title
Delinquent unemployment compensation tax rates
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Blackwell [R] | Rep. Timothy McGinnis [R] | Rep. William Sandifer [R] | Rep. Randy Ligon [R] |
Rep. April Cromer [R] | Rep. Josiah Magnuson [R] | Rep. Joe White [R] | Rep. Jordan Pace [R] |
Rep. James Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Act No. 136 | |
2024-05-29 | Effective date 05/13/24 | |
2024-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-08 | Ratified R 151 | |
2024-04-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2024-04-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2024-04-09 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-02-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-117 Nays-0 |
2024-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Amended |
2024-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cromer, Magnuson, White, Pace, Burns |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ligon |
2023-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sandifer |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |