SC H4020 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require The Condemnor To Provide Notice To The Landowner Of Application For An Ex Parte Order To Gain Entry.
Title
Condemned property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-03-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2018-03-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |