SC H4047 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Act No. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Act No. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 50-15-100 So As To Prohibit The Release Of Records Regarding The Occurrence Of Rare, Threatened, Endangered, Or Imperiled Plant And Animal Species By The Department Of Natural Resources. - Ratified Title
Title
Nongame and endangered wildlife species
Sponsors
Rep. Russell Ott [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Act No. 119 | |
2024-03-14 | Effective date 03/11/24 | |
2024-03-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-03-07 | Ratified R 124 | |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-05-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2023-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |