SC H4091 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-04 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-04 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For The Waiver Of Two Or Fewer Days That Schools In Dorchester County School District 2 Closed In February 2015 Due To Inclement Weather From The Statutory Requirement That School Days Missed Due To Snow, Extreme Weather, Or Other Disruptions Be Made Up, And To Provide That This Requirement Does Not Apply To Time Missed Due To Inclement Weather From These Storms.
Title
Snow day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-05-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2015-04-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-75 Nays-0 |
2015-04-30 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-29 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |