SC H4093 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-2)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Limehouse, Quinn
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Limehouse, Quinn
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Privileges And Immunities Of Citizens Of This State To Born And Preborn Persons Beginning At Conception.
Title
Abortion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Limehouse, Quinn |
2016-04-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine |
2016-03-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Duckworth |
2016-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Simrill, Hiott |
2016-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lowe |
2016-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder, Wells |
2016-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss |
2016-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins, G.A.Brown, Forrester, Pitts, Hardee, Clemmons, Erickson, G.M.Smith, Bannister, McCoy, Lucas, V.S.Moss, Willis, Anthony |
2016-02-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson |
2016-02-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Corley |
2016-02-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sandifer |
2016-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hamilton |
2016-01-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary |
2016-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Allison, Tallon, Taylor |
2015-07-06 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: McEachern |
2015-06-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whitmire, Bingham |
2015-05-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McEachern, Huggins |
2015-05-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Kennedy |
2015-05-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater, Hill, White, Thayer, Gagnon, Gambrell |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0719 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4093&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4093_20150429.htm |