SC H4152 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 44-96-40, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Solid Waste Policy And Management, So As To Provide That Post-use Polymers And Recoverable Feedstocks Used In Pyrolysis And Gasification Processes Are "recovered Materials" And Are Not "solid Waste" For The Purposes Of Regulation By The Department Of Health And Environmental Control.
Title
Solid waste policy and management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 3 (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 22 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 2 (Y: 54 N: 27 NV: 28 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 6 (Y: 57 N: 26 NV: 26 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 4 (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 25 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 19 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 2 (Y: 54 N: 27 NV: 28 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 6 (Y: 57 N: 26 NV: 26 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 4 (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 25 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 19 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-30 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-25 | House | Roll call Yeas-63 Nays-27 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton |
2019-04-24 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-25-19 |
2019-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams, Clyburn, Cobb-Hunter, Henegan |
2019-04-04 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-04-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest, Magnuson, Chumley, Burns, Long, Elliott |
2019-04-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-3-19 |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0574 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs