SC H4179 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Rivers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Rivers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 2-19-10, Relating To The Membership Of The Judicial Merit Selection Commission, So As To Provide That The Governor Appoint Six Members Of The Commission, The President Of The Senate Appoint Two Members, And The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives Appoint Two Members, And To Prohibit A Member Of The General Assembly From Serving As A Member Of The Commission; And By Amending Section 2-19-80, Relating To The Nomination Of Qualified Candidates By The Judicial Merit Selection Commission To The General Assembly, So As To Provide That All Qualified Candidates Be Submitted To The General Assembly For Consideration, And That The Commission Provide A Written Explanation To A Candidate Found Not Qualified.
Title
Judicial Merit Selection Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Rivers |
2023-05-03 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Gilliard, Anderson |
2023-04-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Magnuson, Harris |
2023-04-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham, Bustos, Burns, Dillard, Willis |
2023-04-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cromer, Beach, Oremus |
2023-04-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCabe, White |
2023-04-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ott, McDaniel, Jefferson, Anderson, Gilliard |
2023-04-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King, Rivers |
2023-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0130 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Malloy, Campsen, Sabb, Senn
S0178 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Malloy, Campsen, Sabb, Senn
S0248 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Malloy, Campsen, Sabb, Senn
S0444 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Malloy, Campsen, Sabb, Senn
S0450 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Malloy, Campsen, Sabb, Setzler
H3022 (Similar To) 2023-02-28 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White
H3447 (Similar To) 2023-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Guest, Crawford, Yow, Kilmartin, Vaughan, May, T.A.Morgan, O'Neal, Guffey, Nutt, Lowe, Haddon, Hixon, B.Newton, Neese, Pope, S.Jones
H4183 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten, Guffey
S0872 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Malloy, Campsen, Sabb, Senn
S0178 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Malloy, Campsen, Sabb, Senn
S0248 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Malloy, Campsen, Sabb, Senn
S0444 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Malloy, Campsen, Sabb, Senn
S0450 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Malloy, Campsen, Sabb, Setzler
H3022 (Similar To) 2023-02-28 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White
H3447 (Similar To) 2023-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Guest, Crawford, Yow, Kilmartin, Vaughan, May, T.A.Morgan, O'Neal, Guffey, Nutt, Lowe, Haddon, Hixon, B.Newton, Neese, Pope, S.Jones
H4183 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten, Guffey
S0872 (Similar To) 2024-01-16 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Malloy, Campsen, Sabb, Senn
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4179&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/4179_20230328.htm |