SC H4198 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of West Springdale Road In York County From Its Intersection With Firetower Road To Its Intersection With Lesslie Highway In Memory Of Eric Lessmeister And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Highway That Contain The Words "in Memory Of Eric Lessmeister, 'once A Bearcat, Always A Bearcat'."
Title
Eric Lessmeister
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Gregory Delleney [R] | Rep. Raye Felder [R] | Rep. John King [D] |
Rep. Dennis Moss [R] | Rep. Steve Moss [R] | Rep. Brandon Newton [R] | Rep. Gary Simrill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2017-05-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-05-04 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced |