SC H4200 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - Read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - Read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require The Department Of Agriculture To Create And Maintain A Program To Encourage Schools To Serve Locally Grown, Minimally Processed Farm Foods.
Title
Create and maintain a program to encourage schools to serve locally grown and minimally processed farm foods
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Read second time | |
2012-06-05 | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-04-24 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-04-24 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-04-20 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-04-19 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2012-04-19 | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time | |
2012-04-19 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brady | |
2012-04-18 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper, R.L.Brown | |
2012-03-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-03-28 | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-28 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hodges | |
2011-05-11 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-05-11 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0812 (Similar To) 2011-04-14 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources