SC H4219 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-8
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-8
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO CENSURE MARSHALL C. SANFORD, JR., GOVERNOR OF SOUTH CAROLINA, FOR DERELICTION IN HIS DUTIES OF OFFICE, FOR OFFICIAL MISCONDUCT IN OFFICE, AND FOR ABUSES OF POWER WHILE IN OFFICE THAT HAS BROUGHT RIDICULE, DISHONOR, SHAME, AND DISGRACE TO HIMSELF, THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, AND TO ITS CITIZENS.
Title
Censure Marshall C. Sanford, Jr., Governor Of South Carolina, For Dereliction In His Duties Of Office, For Official Misconduct In Office, And For Abuses Of Power While In Office That Has Brought Ridicule, Dishonor, Shame, And Disgrace To Himself, The State Of South Carolina, And To Its Citizens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-8 | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced SJ-8 | |
2010-01-13 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-01-13 | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-11 HJ-25 | |
2010-01-13 | Adopted, sent to Senate HJ-24 | |
2010-01-13 | Amended HJ-20 | |
2010-01-12 | Special order, set for Wednesday, January 13, 2010, immediately following roll call (Under H. 4291) HJ-68 | |
2010-01-12 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary HJ-68 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-61 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced HJ-60 | |
2009-12-01 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4219&session=118 |