SC H4477 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Add A New Section Preserving The Freedom Of South Carolinians With Respect To The Providing Of Health Care Services, To Prohibit Any Law, Regulation, Or Rule To Compel An Individual, Employer, Or Health Care Provider To Participate In A Health Care System, To Allow Individuals And Employers To Pay Directly For Lawful Health Care Services Without Penalties Or Fines For These Direct Payments, To Provide That The Purchase Or Sale Of Health Insurance In Private Health Care Systems Must Not Be Prohibited By Law, Regulation, Or Rule, To Provide Those Incentives In Which The Rights Provided By This Section Do Not Apply, And To Provide Appropriate Definitions.
Title
Constitutional amendment relating to health care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-12 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-11-29 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3269 (Similar To) 2011-01-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Patrick, Viers
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4477&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/4477_20111129.htm |