SC H4559 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Memorialize The Congress Of The United States To Enact Senate Bill S.1846, The Homeowner Flood Insurance Affordability Act Of 2013, In Order To Delay Flood Insurance Rate Increases Caused By The Biggert-waters Flood Insurance Reform Act Of 2012, And To Require The Federal Emergency Management Agency To Study The Affordability Of That Act On Property Owners And To Implement An Accurate Flood Mapping Approach Before Raising Flood Insurance Rates; And To Undertake Efforts To Develop A Long-term Solution To Ensuring An Affordable, Accessible, And Sustainable Flood Insurance Program.
Title
Homeowner Flood Insurance Affordability Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-06 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2014-02-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced |