SC H4567 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 44-137-25 So As To Authorize The Use Of Investigational Drugs Or Treatments For Certain Patients Who Contract An Infection, Illness, Or Other Health Condition Caused By A Declared Epidemic Or Pandemic Disease.
Title
Pandemic disease and experimental treatments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry |
2022-03-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell |
2022-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, White |
2022-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2022-01-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones, Gilliam, Yow |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2021-11-10 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4858 (Similar To) 2022-01-25 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary