SC H4595 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Act No. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Act No. 148
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revise Paragraph 1a.54, Section 1a, Part Ib, Directing The Department Of Education To Transfer Certain Funds To Meet Maintenance Of Effort Requirements For The Individuals With Disabilities Education Act By Further Providing For The Dollar Amount Of The Transfer And For Other Terms And Conditions Of The Transfer; And To Provide That Notwithstanding Any Other Provision Of Law, School Districts Uniformly May Negotiate Salaries Below The School District Salary Schedule For The 2012-2013 School Year For Retired Teachers
Title
Requirements for the Individuals with Disabilities Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Act No. 148 | |
2012-04-25 | Effective date 04/23/12 | |
2012-04-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-04-19 | Ratified R 167 | |
2012-04-18 | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 | |
2012-04-18 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2012-04-13 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2012-04-12 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2012-04-12 | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 | |
2012-04-12 | Read second time | |
2012-04-12 | Amended | |
2012-04-12 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2012-04-11 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-02-01 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 | |
2012-01-31 | Read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Amended | |
2012-01-26 | Debate adjourned until Tues., 01-31-12 | |
2012-01-25 | Debate adjourned until Thur., 01-26-12 | |
2012-01-24 | Debate adjourned until Wed., 01-25-12 | |
2012-01-18 | Debate adjourned until Tues., 01-24-12 | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |