SC H4612 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Political Subdivision Of The State That Enacts An Ordinance, Rule, Or Regulation That Imposes A Fine For An Offense That Exceeds The Fine Imposed By A Similar Offense Contained In This Chapter May Not Collect An Amount That Exceeds The Maximum Fine Contained In The Similar Offense Contained In This Chapter.
Title
Uniform traffic laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Amended |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-06-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Amended |
2014-05-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Amended |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Polled out of committee Transportation |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-05-02 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-05-01 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2014-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2014-05-01 | House | Read second time |
2014-05-01 | House | Amended |
2014-04-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper |
2014-04-29 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |