SC H4612 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 217
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 217
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Applicants For General Contractor Licensure Or Mechanical Contract Licensure Who Are Subject To Certain Financial Statement Requirements May Provide Certain Surety Bonds In Lieu Of Providing These Financial Statements, To Provide Requirements Concerning These Surety Bonds, And To Provide Procedures For Filing Claims Against These Surety Bonds
Title
General and mechanical contractor licensure, financial statements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Free Conference Report (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - House: Adopt Amendment (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 16 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - House: Adopt Amendment (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 16 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 217 | |
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 257 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Free conference report adopted |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Free conference committee appointed Bennett, Johnson, Gambrell |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-2 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Free conference powers granted |
2018-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2018-05-08 | House | Free conference report adopted |
2018-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2018-05-08 | House | Free conference committee appointed Sandifer, Anderson, Henderson |
2018-05-08 | House | Free conference powers granted |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Bennett, Johnson, Gambrell |
2018-04-19 | House | House insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Sandifer, Henderson, Anderson |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-0 Nays-37 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2018-03-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-80 Nays-19 |
2018-03-08 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2018-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Amended |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0870 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry