SC H4628 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Huggins
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Huggins
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "rehabilitation Of Abandoned And Dilapidated Buildings Act", To Provide Definitions, To Provide A Municipality May Bring A Cause Of Action Against The Owner Of Property Not In Substantial Compliance With Certain Municipal Ordinances, To Provide Who May Serve As A Court-appointed Receiver For Property Subject To This Cause Of Action, And To Provide The Powers Of A Court-appointed Receiver, To Provide Reporting Requirements Of The Municipality Concerning A Violation Against Which The Municipality May Bring A Cause Of Action Under This Act, And To Provide Certain Remedies And Procedures, Among Other Things.
Title
Rehabilitation of Abandoned and Dilapidated Buildings Act
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Alexander [D] | Rep. James Harrison [R] | Sen. Kevin Johnson [D] | Rep. Garry Smith [R] |
Rep. David Weeks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Huggins | |
2012-03-07 | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: G.M.Smith | |
2012-02-22 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Alexander | |
2012-01-24 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson | |
2012-01-19 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins, Weeks, G.M.Smith | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1117 (Similar To) 2012-01-24 - Referred to Subcommittee: Cleary (ch), Ford, S.Martin, Gregory
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4628&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/4628_20120118.htm |