SC H4629 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-18)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Cole, Allison, Forrester, Parker
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Cole, Allison, Forrester, Parker
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide A Health Management Organization And Benefit Plan May Not Condition The Participation In Its Medical Eye Care Network By An Ophthalmologist Or Optometrist On The Participation Of The Ophthalmologist Or Optometrist In A Vision Care Plan Offered By Or Administered Through The Health Management Organization Or Benefit Plan.
Title
Health management organization and benefit plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Cole, Allison, Forrester, Parker | |
2012-02-09 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith, Weeks | |
2012-02-07 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brannon, Stringer | |
2012-01-25 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan | |
2012-01-24 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1130 (Similar To) 2012-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4629&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/4629_20120118.htm |