SC H4662 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 16-3-85, Relating To Homicide By Child Abuse, So As To Increase The Age Of A Child Under This Section From Under The Age Of Eleven To Under The Age Of Eighteen.
Title
Homicide by child abuse
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Don Chapman [R] | Rep. Roger Nutt [R] | Rep. Raye Felder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-12-14 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0839 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3023 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3023 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4662&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/4662_20231214.htm |