SC H4716 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Act No. 144
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Act No. 144
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increase The Portion Of Vegetation The Department May Manage Along The Interstate Highway System, And To Allow Local Governmental Entities To Conduct Vegetation Management Activities Beyond The Portions Of Roadways Managed By The Department; And To Repeal Sections 57-23-810, 57-23-815, 57-23-820, 57-23-825, 57-23-830, 57-23-835, 57-23-840, And 57-23-850 All Relating To Roadside Vegetation Management Procedures In Various Counties
Title
Dillon County transportation department
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Act No. 144 | |
2012-04-05 | Effective date 04/02/12 | |
2012-04-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Ratified R 162 | |
2012-03-21 | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 | |
2012-03-21 | Concurred in amendment | |
2012-03-14 | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 | |
2012-03-14 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2012-03-14 | Amended | |
2012-03-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-03-06 | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 | |
2012-03-06 | Read second time | |
2012-03-06 | Amended | |
2012-03-01 | Recalled from Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-02-08 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-02-07 | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 | |
2012-02-07 | Read second time | |
2012-02-02 | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 23 | 800 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 23 | 810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 23 | 815 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 23 | 820 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 23 | 825 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 23 | 830 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 23 | 835 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 23 | 840 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 23 | 850 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 23 | 855 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |