SC H4809 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar SJ-7
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar SJ-7
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND ACT 525 OF 1982, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE ELECTION OF MEMBERS OF THE CHESTER COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD OF TRUSTEES, SO AS TO REVISE THE DATE BY WHICH A PERSON SHALL FILE A STATEMENT OF CANDIDACY FOR A SEAT ON THE CHESTER COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD OF TRUSTEES.
Title
Revise The Date By Which A Person Shall File A Statement Of Candidacy For A Seat On The Chester County School Board Of Trustees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar SJ-7 | |
2010-04-15 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-36 | |
2010-04-14 | Read second time HJ-24 | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-21 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4809&session=118 |