SC H4819 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 147
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 147
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 56-3-1960, Relating In Part To Parking Placards For Handicapped Persons, So As To Allow Applicants For Handicapped Parking Placards To Provide A Photograph For The Placard Subject To The Department Of Motor Vehicle's Approval. - Ratified Title
Title
Parking Placards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Act No. 147 | |
2024-05-29 | Effective date 05/13/24 | |
2024-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-08 | Ratified R 163 | |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |