SC H4869 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Gagnon
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Gagnon
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-103-15, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Missions And Focuses Of Institutions Of Higher Learning, So As To Provide The State Technical And Comprehensive Education System May Authorize Accelerated Bachelor Of Science In Nursing Degree Completion Programs For Students Of Technical College Associate Of Science In Nursing Degree Programs, And To Provide The Authorization Of Such Degree Programs Only Is Allowed When New State General Funds Are Not Appropriated For The Operation Of The Program.
Title
Higher Education Nursing Program Authorizations
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Thayer [R] | Rep. John West [R] | Rep. William Whitmire [R] | Rep. Jerry Carter [R] |
Rep. West Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Gagnon |
2022-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox |
2022-01-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4869&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/4869_20220126.htm |