SC H4869 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - Act No. 180
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 38-3-150, Relating To The Authority Of The Director Of The Department Of Insurance Or His Designees To Conduct Examinations, Investigations, And Hearings, So As To Provide For The Confidentiality Of Such Investigations; By Amending Section 38-9-200, Relating To Conditions For Allowing Reinsurance Credits, So As To Revise Certain Conditions; By Amending Section 38-13-10, Relating To Insurer Examinations, So As To Provide Such Examinations Are Financial Examinations, To Apply The Provisions To Health Maintenance Organizations And Other Licensees Of The Department, To Provide Market Conduct Examinations, And To Remove Obsolete Provisions, Among Other Things; By Amending Section 38-13-70, Relating To Investigations Of Alleged Violations, So As To Provide The Director Or His Designees May Conduct Investigations, To Provide For The Confidentiality Of Investigations, And To Provide Final Orders Disciplining Licensees Are Public Information, Among Other Things; By Amending Section 38-57-130, Relating To Insurance Trade Practices, So As To Provide Revised Exemptions From Provisions Prohibiting Misrepresentations, Special Inducements, And Rebates In Insurance Contracts; And By Amending Section 38-77-170, Relating To The Required Conditions To Sue Or Recover Under Uninsured Motorist Provision When The Operator Of The Motor Vehicle Causing Injury Or Damage Is Unknown, So As To Allow For The Submission Of A Recording Of The Accident, Among Other Things. - Ratified Title
Title
Department of Insurance procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Act No. 180 | |
2024-05-29 | Effective date 05/20/24 | |
2024-05-20 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-15 | Ratified R 225 | |
2024-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2024-05-09 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Amendment Reconsidered |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-02-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0 |
2024-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Amended |
2024-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ligon |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0957 (Similar To) 2024-02-27 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 13 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 13 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 3 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 57 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 77 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 9 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |