SC H4937 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Act No. 152
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Act No. 152
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 7-7-450, Relating To Designation Of Voting Precincts In Pickens County, So As To Authorize The Pickens County Board Of Voter Registration And Elections, With Approval From A Majority Of The Pickens County Legislative Delegation, To Locate A Polling Place Within Five Miles Of A Precinct's Boundaries If No Suitable Location Exists Within The Precinct. - Ratified Title
Title
Pickens County Voting Precincts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Act No. 152 | |
2024-05-30 | Effective date 05/13/24 | |
2024-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-08 | Ratified R 168 | |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Hutto, Malloy, Garrett, Kimbrell |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-01-31 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0 |
2024-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-25 | House | Recalled from Pickens Delegation |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to Pickens Delegation |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |