SC H4966 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Designate The Month Of May 2016 As "mental Health Month" In South Carolina And To Raise Community Awareness And Understanding Of Mental Illness And The Need For Appropriate And Accessible Services For All People With Mental Illnesses.
Title
Mental Health Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-02-23 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |