SC H5006 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Interchange Located At The Intersection Of Interstate Highway 95 And South Carolina Highway 341 In Sumter County In Honor Of Nascar Racing Legend Cale Yarborough And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Interchange That Contain The Words "nascar Racing Legend Cale Yarborough Interchange".
Title
NASCAR Racing Legend Cale Yarborough Interchange
Sponsors
Rep. Grady Brown [D] | Rep. Phillip Lowe [R] | Rep. Joseph Neal [D] | Rep. Murrell Smith [R] |
Rep. David Weeks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence | |
2012-05-24 | Recalled from Committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-27 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-27 | Introduced | |
2012-03-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-03-22 | Adopted, sent to Senate | |
2012-03-21 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2012-03-14 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2012-03-14 | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
S1335 (Similar To) 2012-03-14 - Referred to Committee on Transportation