SC H5069 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-05 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 14-23-1040, Relating To Qualifications Of Probate Judges, So As To Revise The Qualifications For Probate Judges In Counties Greater Than Ninety Thousand In Population, And To Grandfather Those Probate Judges Currently Serving.
Title
Probate judge qualifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell |
2024-02-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White |
2024-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lowe |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |