SC H5157 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 16-3-100 So As To Provide That Fertilized Human Eggs Or Human Embryos That Exist In Any Form Outside Of The Uterus Of A Human Body Are Not Considered An Unborn Child Or Other Term Connoting A Human Being For Any Purpose Under State Law.
Title
Human Embryos
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers |
2024-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wetmore |
2024-02-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=5157&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/5157_20240227.htm |