SC H5366 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-31 - Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-31 - Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Create A Committee To Study And Determine Whether The Samworth Wildlife Management Area Should Be Redesignated As A Category 2 Waterfowl Area, To Provide For Membership Of The Study Committee And Method Of Appointment Of Its Members, And To Require The Study Committee To Prepare A Report With Findings And Recommendations For The General Assembly.
Title
Samworth Wildlife Management Area Redesignation Study Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2016-05-24 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2016-05-19 | House | Recalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2016-05-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2016-05-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |