SC H5395 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Act No. 242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Act No. 242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Act 879 Of 1954, As Amended, Relating To The Creation Of The Lancaster County Natural Gas Authority, So As To Clarify Per Diem Provisions Applicable To Members Of The Board Of Directors And To Delete The Requirement That All Unencumbered Revenues From The System Be Paid Over To The Municipalities Served By The Authority And To Provide That These Funds Must Be Used Instead To Expand The System Or To Reduce Customer Rates. - Ratified Title
Title
Lancaster County Natural Gas Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-23 | Act No. 242 | |
2024-05-20 | Effective date 05/13/24 | |
2024-05-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-08 | Ratified R 176 | |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0 |
2024-04-16 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |