SC H5458 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Act No. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-23 - Act No. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, Relating To Standards For Licensing Ambulatory Surgical Facilities, Designated As Regulation Document Number 5264, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The South Carolina Code Of Laws. - Ratified Title
Title
Department of Health and Environmental Control - JR to Approve Regulation Document No. 5264
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-23 | Act No. 248 | |
2024-05-29 | Effective date 05/20/24 | |
2024-05-20 | Signed By Governor | |
2024-05-15 | Ratified R 236 | |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-05-02 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-3 |
2024-05-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-25 | House | Debate adjourned |
2024-04-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |