SC S0052 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - Recommitted to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - Recommitted to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Fix Noon On Wednesday, February 2, 2011, As The Time To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2011; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 2, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2011; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court For The Fifth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, To Fill The Unexpired Term That Expires June 30, 2013; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court For The Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, To Fill The Unexpired Term That Expires June 30, 2012, And The Subsequent Full Term That Expires June 30, 2018; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court At-large, Seat 9, To Fill The Unexpired Term That Expires June 30, 2015; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court For The Ninth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, To Fill The Subsequent Full Term That Expires June 30, 2016.
Title
Judicial elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | Recommitted to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-02-01 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced | |
2011-01-26 | Adopted, sent to House | |
2011-01-26 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced | |
2010-12-01 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |