SC S0108 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fix Noon On Wednesday, February 1, 2017, As The Time To Elect A Successor To A Certain Justice Of The Supreme Court, Seat 5, Upon His Swearing In As Chief Justice Of The Supreme Court, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office, Which Will Expire July 31, 2020; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2017; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 2, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2017; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 9, Upon His Election To The Court Of Appeals, Chief Judge, Seat 5, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, Seventh Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Upon His Retirement On Or Before February 10, 2017, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office, Which Will Expire June 30, 2018; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At-large, Seat 1, Upon His Retirement On Or Before December 31, 2016, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2021; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Eighth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Upon His Retirement On Or Before December 31, 2016, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office, Which Will Expire June 30, 2022; To Elect A Judge To A Newly Created Seat On The Family Court, At -large, Seat 7, Whose Term Will Be From July 1, 2017, Until June 30, 2023; To Elect A Judge To A Newly Created Seat On The Family Court, At-large, Seat 8, Whose Term Will Be From July 1, 2017, Until June 30, 2023; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Administrative Law Court, Seat 2, Upon His Retirement On Or Before June 30, 2017, The Successor Will Fill A New Term Of That Office Which Will Expire On June 30, 2022.
Title
Judicial elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0108&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/108_20161213.htm |